Garcia De Len v. New York University
Plaintiff: Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon
Defendant: New York University
Case Number: 1:2021cv05005
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, that NYU's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint shall be August 27, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. New York University answer due 8/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/21/2021) (ate)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and extend deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Keara M. Gordon dated July 20, 2021. Document filed by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time).(Gordon, Keara)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Blake G. Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24793748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Blake G. Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24793748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit affidavit, #3 Exhibit NC Cert of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit SC cert of good standing).(Abbott, Blake)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 23, 2021 and requirement that the parties submit a case management plan by July 12, 2021 addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Keara M. Gordon dated July 8, 2021. filed by New York University. ENDORSEMENT: The cases are not related within the meaning of the Court's local rules for the division of business among judges and will not be reassigned. If a motion to dismiss is filed by the end of July, it is not necessary to file a case management plan and the initial conference will be postponed until the motion is fully briefed and decided. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2021) (cf)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 23, 2021 and requirement that the parties submit a case management plan by July 12, 2021 addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Keara M. Gordon dated July 8, 2021. Document filed by New York University..(Gordon, Keara)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Keara M. Gordon dated June 22, 2021 re: notice of relatedness. Document filed by New York University..(Gordon, Keara)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keara M. Gordon on behalf of New York University..(Gordon, Keara)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/10/2021) (cf)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York University. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon..(Toptani, Edward)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward G. Toptani. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon.(Toptani, Edward) Modified on 6/8/2021 (vf).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against New York University. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24639904)Document filed by Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon..(Toptani, Edward)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Len..(Toptani, Edward) Modified on 6/7/2021 (jgo).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Toptani, Edward)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against New York University. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24637976)Document filed by Nelcy Mabel De Len..(Toptani, Edward) Modified on 6/7/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia De Len v. New York University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelcy Mabel Garcia De Leon
Represented By: Edward G. Toptani
Represented By: Blake G. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University
Represented By: Keara M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?