Flores et al v. Boro Concrete Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mauricio Pereira, Hector Calero Aguilar, Jose Serrano Guzman, Cesar Reyes-Argueta, Jose Elmer Flores, Jaime Mejia and Melvin Vigil Mejia
Defendant: Boro Concrete Corp., Eric Chavez and Martin J. Moore
Case Number: 1:2021cv05006
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Hector Calero Aguilar, Jose Elmer Flores, Jose Serrano Guzman, Jaime Mejia, Melvin Vigil Mejia, Mauricio Pereira, Cesar Reyes-Argueta..(O'Donnell, James)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Lehrburger no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/8/2021) (vfr)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA"), 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, no later than one week after an answer is filed, the parties shall contact the Chambers of the assigned Magistrate Judge to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled below. Further, to facilitate those settlement discussions, the parties shall, no later than three weeks after an answer is filed, exchange limited discovery in aid of settlement; the parties shall confer with respect to the scope of such limited discovery, and promptly raise any disputes with the assigned Magistrate Judge in accordance with his or her Individual Rules and Practices. Separate and apart from the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 15, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/8/2021) (vfr)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boro Concrete Corp., Eric Chavez, Martin J. Moore. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation. (vf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boro Concrete Corp., and Martin J. Moore, and Eric Chavez, as individuals, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hector Calero Aguilar, Jose Elmer Flores, Jose Serrano Guzman, Jaime Mejia, Melvin Vigil Mejia, Mauricio Pereira, Cesar Reyes-Argueta..(Avshalumov, Roman)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boro Concrete Corp., Eric Chavez, Martin J. Moore. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24637840)Document filed by Hector Calero Aguilar, Melvin Vigil Mejia, Jaime Mejia, Cesar Reyes-Argueta, Jose Elmer Flores, Mauricio Pereira, Jose Serrano Guzman..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Boro Concrete Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Pereira
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Calero Aguilar
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Serrano Guzman
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Reyes-Argueta
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Elmer Flores
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Mejia
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Vigil Mejia
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boro Concrete Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?