L.G.C. v. Decker et al.
Plaintiff: L.G.C
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Thomas Decker and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv05007
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas. Document filed by L.G.C. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lauterback, Molly)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by L.G.C. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 6/16/2021 (km).
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by L.G.C. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 6/16/2021 (km).
June 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Molly Lauterback. RE-FILE Document No. #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
June 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Molly Lauterback. RE-FILE Document No. #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; Do not select all parties, select each defendant you want to dismiss from the action. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241:The Court, having examined the Petition in this action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, HEREBY ORDERS that: Within sixty days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer, motion, or other response to the Petition. Petitioner may file and serve any reply papers, if any, within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondents answer. Petitioner shall serve a copy of this Order on the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York on or before June 17, 2021, and file of proof of service on or before June 24, 2021. SO ORDERED., Thomas Decker answer due on 8/9/2021; Merrick Garland answer due on 8/9/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due on 8/9/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/10/2021) (rj)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(gp) (pc).
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 465401280613)Document filed by L.G.C..(gp) Modified on 6/7/2021 (gp). (gp).
June 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
June 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21-MC-465..(gp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.G.C. v. Decker et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.C
Represented By: Molly Lauterback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?