Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Solas Oled LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Defendant: Solas Oled LTD. and Neodron LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05205
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Wang on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Wang, Philip)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #25 Motion for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #26 Motion for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #21 Motion for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Bayne Gore on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Gore, Laura)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #21 MOTION for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870118. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #22 MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24871117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shane Hunt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Hunt, Shane)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24871117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Legum in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Legum, Nathaniel)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sean Trainor in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Trainor, Daniel)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Whilt in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Whilt, Nicholas)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darin Snyder in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Snyder, Darin)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Yagura in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 TX Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Yagura, Ryan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870118. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Kappos in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kappos, John)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Abby F. Rudzin dated July 26, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter for a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Rudzin, Abby)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #19 MOTION for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837266. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837255. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837266. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Neil A. Rubin, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Neil)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reza Mirzaie, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Mirzaie, Reza)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24837255. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc Fenster, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fenster, Marc)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24831003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24831003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James S Tsuei, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Tsuei, James)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24807371. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24807371. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Wang, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Cooper, Brett)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, that the parties' proposed deadlines referenced above, are adopted. By July 14, 2021, Defendants shall file any pre-motion letter in anticipation of a motion to dismiss and by July 26, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a responsive letter. If Defendants' intend to answer the complaint, they shall do so by August 6, 2021. Any anticipated motions, and related proposed briefing schedules, will be discussed during the initial conference on August 26, 2021. Neodron LTD. answer due 8/6/2021; Solas Oled LTD. answer due 8/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/14/2021) (va)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated 7/14/2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Cooper, Brett)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Mirzaie, Reza)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rudzin, Abby)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/12/2021) (cf)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Drew Bennett Hollander on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Hollander, Drew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett E. Cooper on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Cooper, Brett)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Neodron LTD. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. Document filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Solas Oled LTD. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. Document filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Rudzin, Abby)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nmo)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) (pc).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401280929)Document filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G) (pc).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order REMARK - SEALING ORDER DOCKETED IN 21-MC-485..(pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solas Oled LTD...(pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neodron LTD...(pc)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Abby Faith Rudzin to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Solas Oled LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solas Oled LTD.
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Brett E. Cooper
Represented By: Drew Bennett Hollander
Represented By: James Tsuei
Represented By: Neil A. Rubin
Represented By: Philip Wang
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neodron LTD.
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Brett E. Cooper
Represented By: Drew Bennett Hollander
Represented By: James Tsuei
Represented By: Neil A. Rubin
Represented By: Philip Wang
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Abby Faith Rudzin
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Represented By: John Kappos
Represented By: Laura Bayne Gore
Represented By: Nathaniel Legum
Represented By: Nicholas Whilt
Represented By: Ryan Ken Yagura
Represented By: Shane Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Abby Faith Rudzin
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Represented By: John Kappos
Represented By: Laura Bayne Gore
Represented By: Nathaniel Legum
Represented By: Nicholas Whilt
Represented By: Ryan Ken Yagura
Represented By: Shane Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?