Mundo v. Highgate Hotels, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Mundo
Defendant: Anna Surina, Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell and Park Lane Hotel New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv05393
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/1/2021.(ah)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery is to be completed either: a. Within one hundred twenty (120) days of the date of this Order, specifically by not later than 11/22/2021 or b. Within a period exceeding 120 days, with the Court's approval, if the case presents unique complexities or other exceptional circumstances, specifically by not later than 01/24/2022. Depositions to be completed by 11/15/2021. All expert discovery (ordinarily conducted following the completion of fact discovery) including parties' expert reports and depositions, witness lists and identification of documents pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2),(3) and 35(b), is to be completed by: a. Plaintiff- 12/24/2021, b. Defendant- 01/21/2022. All parties do not consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2021. Deposition due by 1/21/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/24/2022. Expert Discovery due by 1/21/2022. Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/26/2021) (ate) Modified on 7/26/2021 (ate).
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Asish Anne Nelluvely, Esq. dated July 23, 2021 re: Joint Letter in Compliance with Court Order dated on June 28, 2021. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Management Plan Scheduling Order).(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are directed to submit a joint letter no later than July 23, 2021 addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s); (2) any contemplated motions; (3) the prospect for settlement; and (4) whether the parties consent to proceed for all purposes before the Magistrate Judge designated for this action. The parties are also directed to submit a completed Case Management Plan. The Case Management Plan must provide that discovery is to be completed within four months unless otherwise permitted by the Court. A model Case Management Plan is available on the Court's website: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-victor-marrero. Submissions must be made in accordance with Judge Marrero's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at the Court's website. The Court will assess the need for an Initial Case Management Conference after reviewing the submission. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/28/2021) (nb)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (jpt)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer to Complaint served on Marc W. Garbar, Esq., Brandon J. Broderick on June 24, 2021. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Marc W. Garbar, Esq., Brandon J. Broderick on June 24, 2021. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Park Lane Hotel New York..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Park Lane Hotel New York..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Marc W. Garbar, Esq., Brandon J. Broderick on June 24, 2021. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P...(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P...(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Rafael Martinez on behalf of Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Martinez, Larry)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan D. Farrell on behalf of Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Farrell, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asish Anne Nelluvely on behalf of Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Asish Anne Nelluvely re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Jason Londell and Anna Surina must be added again with party text 'in their corporate capacities'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Asish Anne Nelluvely. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jason Londell, Anna Surina. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Asish Anne Nelluvely. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (sj)
June 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
June 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
June 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF REMOVAL; EXHIBIT A - STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT and CIVIL COVER SHEET served on Marc W. Garbar, Esq., BRANDON J. BRODERICK on June 18, 2021. Service was made by FEDEX. Document filed by Highgate Hotels, L.P., Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Anna Surina..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nelluvely, Asish)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 653407/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24691192).Document filed by Jason Londell, Park Lane Hotel New York, Highgate Hotels, L.P., Anna Surina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint).(Nelluvely, Asish)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mundo v. Highgate Hotels, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Surina
Represented By: Asish Anne Nelluvely
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highgate Hotels, L.P.
Represented By: Asish Anne Nelluvely
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Londell
Represented By: Asish Anne Nelluvely
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Lane Hotel New York
Represented By: Asish Anne Nelluvely
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?