Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Excel Interiors Associates Inc.
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Respondent: Excel Interiors Associates Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05394
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, served. Excel Interiors Associates Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Excel Interiors Associates Inc.. (sj)
June 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
June 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marimon on behalf of Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Brejt, Jenny)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Brejt, Jenny)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Excel Interiors Associates Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Brejt, Jenny)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brejt, Jenny)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24691193).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Excel Interiors NYCDCC member, #2 Wall-Ceiling 2017, #3 Excel Interiors NYCDCC no longer member, #4 Collection Policy, #5 November 2, 2020 Notice of Hearing, #6 February 6, 2021 Arbitration Award, #7 History Bill, #8 Proposed Judgment).(Brejt, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Excel Interiors Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Excel Interiors Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?