Atehortua v. City Of New York
Plaintiff: John J. Atehortua
Defendant: City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv05418
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Jeffrey Robert Skochil on behalf of City Of New York..(Skochil, David)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City Of New York..(Skochil, David)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff's request is granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 16, 2021 is adjourned to September 24, 2021 at 10:00a.m. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/28/2021) (nb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Bernard D. Friedman, Esq. dated 06/28/2021. Document filed by John J. Atehortua. Return Date set for 9/16/2021 at 10:30 AM..(Friedman, Bernard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/22/2021) (nb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City Of New York served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. Service was made by E-MAIL. Document filed by John J. Atehortua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Receipt).(Friedman, Bernard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (vf)
June 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John J. Atehortua..(Friedman, Bernard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Friedman, Bernard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York. Document filed by John J. Atehortua..(Friedman, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atehortua v. City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Atehortua
Represented By: Bernard D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: David Jeffrey Robert Skochil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?