Trackthings LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trackthings LLC
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05440
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2021) (vfr)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher Kao dated July 12, 2021., #1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED with the understanding that no further extensions will be forthcoming. SO ORDERED. (Netgear, Inc. answer due 8/30/2021.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/13/21) (yv)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher Kao dated July 12, 2021. Document filed by Netgear, Inc...(Kao, Christopher)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Netgear, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service was accepted by Casey Pineda, Managing Agent. Document filed by Trackthings LLC..(Gilman, Timothy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gilman, Timothy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Netgear, Inc...(jgo)
June 22, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy Kelso Gilman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the second page of the PDF was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Gerson on behalf of Trackthings LLC..(Gerson, Christopher)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Binni N. Shah on behalf of Trackthings LLC..(Shah, Binni)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Gilman, Timothy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trackthings LLC..(Gilman, Timothy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Netgear, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trackthings LLC..(Gilman, Timothy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gilman, Timothy) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jgo).
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Netgear, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24698638)Document filed by Trackthings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,642,017, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,332,442, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 10,107,893).(Gilman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trackthings LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trackthings LLC
Represented By: Binni N. Shah
Represented By: Christopher Michael Gerson
Represented By: Timothy Kelso Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?