Searles v. Robert
Plaintiff: Christopher Searles
Defendant: Joyce Robert and Joyce Robert, M.D.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Mt. Sinai Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05444
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2021) (jwh)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brandon Cowart dated July 22, 2021. Document filed by Joyce Robert, M.D...(Cowart, Brandon)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brandon Cowart dated June 24, 2021. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/1/2021) (vfr)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2021) (vfr)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brandon Cowart dated June 24, 2021. Document filed by Joyce Robert, M.D...(Cowart, Brandon)
June 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joyce Robert; Mt. Sinai Health System, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151033/2019..Document filed by Joyce Robert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Employment Certification)).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searles v. Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Mt. Sinai Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Robert
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Robert, M.D.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?