Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Effy Jewelers Corp.
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Defendant: Effy Jewelers Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05536
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Joseph Sofer dated August 23, 2021 re: Extension of Answer Deadline. Document filed by Effy Jewelers Corp...(Sofer, Joseph)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter Request to Extend Answer Deadline filed by Effy Jewelers Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an extension to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer or response no later than August 27, 2021. So Ordered., (Effy Jewelers Corp. answer due 8/27/2021.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/22/21) (yv)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Joseph Sofer dated July 21, 2021 re: Request to Extend Answer Deadline. Document filed by Effy Jewelers Corp...(Sofer, Joseph)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Sofer on behalf of Effy Jewelers Corp...(Sofer, Joseph)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Effy Jewelers Corp. served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Effy Jewelers Corp...(jgo)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Effy Jewelers Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so redesignated. (wb)
June 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons in a Civil Case form Rev. (6/12). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
June 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
June 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 25, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (vf)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Effy Jewelers Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 6/25/2021 (vf).
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Effy Jewelers Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24717042)Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Effy Jewelers Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Effy Jewelers Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Sofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?