Luna v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Juna Luna and Juan Luna
Defendant: Craig R. Anderson and Keller Foundations, LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: TBBK Direct Leasing, LLC and Keller North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05666
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/10/2021. (ade)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomas Blaquera Lim on behalf of Craig R. Anderson, Keller Foundations, LLC, TBBK Direct Leasing, LLC..(Lim, Tomas)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER The dial-in for today's 11 AM teleconference is (888) 363-4749, access code: 2712517. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald) (Text Only Order)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Juan Luna.(Laufer, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C. Laufer on behalf of Juan Luna..(Laufer, Andrew)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL TELECONFERENCE: If any party has not appeared by counsel in this Court, counsel who have appeared must forthwith send a copy of this notice to that party through the counsel representing the party prior to removal. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/8/2021) (ate)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Craig R. Anderson, Keller Foundations, LLC, TBBK Direct Leasing, LLC..(Bongiovanni, Mark)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bongiovanni, Mark)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Juan Luna; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Keller Foundations, LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service on Defendant TBBK Leasing LLC, #3 Exhibit C-Authorization for Electronic Filing, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service on Defendant Craig R. Anderson, #5 Exhibit E-Authorization for Electronic Filing, #6 Exhibit F-Supplemental Summons, #7 Exhibit G-Amended Verified Complaint, #8 Exhibit H-Affidavit of Service on Defendant Keller Foundations, LLC).(Bongiovanni, Mark)
July 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Mark Bongiovanni. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Keller North America, Inc. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Bongiovanni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jun Luna, TBBK Direct Leasing, LLC, Keller North America, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Bongiovanni to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
July 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Keller Management Services, Inc. for Keller North America, Inc.. Document filed by Keller North America, Inc...(Bongiovanni, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bongiovanni, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153996/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24739084).Document filed by Keller North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Bongiovanni, Mark) Modified on 7/1/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juna Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Luna
Represented By: Andrew C. Laufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: TBBK Direct Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Keller North America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Mark Bongiovanni
Represented By: Tomas Blaquera Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Foundations, LLC
Represented By: Tomas Blaquera Lim
Represented By: Mark Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?