Center For Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc., Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Center For Biological Diversity, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. and Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association
Defendant: Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Martha Williams
Case Number: 1:2021cv05706
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1531
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time and for adjournments of initial conference and deadline for pre-conference submissions. The deadline for the Defendants to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to October 7, 2021. The Initial Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to October 21, 2021 at 10:00AM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Parties are reminded that they are to jointly submit, by one week prior to the conference, a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order consistent with the Court's individual practices. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and for adjournments of initial conference and deadline for pre-conference submissions addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 19, 2021. Document filed by Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams..(Rovner, Allison)
August 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due by 10/7/2021.Set/Reset Hearings: (Initial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (mf)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Center For Biological Diversity, Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (mail receipts and delivery confirmation)).(Segee, Brian)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on September 8, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/2/2021) (va)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Rovner on behalf of Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams..(Rovner, Allison)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Elise Pautler Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Brian Paul Segee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martha Williams..(pc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Debra Haaland..(pc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service..(pc)
July 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Brian Paul Segee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24744397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Elise Pautler Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24746412. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Elise Pautler Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24746412. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elise Pautler Bennett, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission PHV).(Bennett, Elise)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Brian Paul Segee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24744397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Notarized Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc...(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Debra Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc...(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martha Williams, in her official capacity as Acting Director for the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc...(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc...(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segee, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24743154)Document filed by Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association, Center For Biological Diversity, Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association..(Segee, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeepers Chesapeake, Inc.
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lower Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middle Susquehanna Riverkeeper Association
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?