Baerga v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Justin E. Baerga
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Commissioner Dermot Shea, Supervisory Officers Sally Roes, Wnorowskisg, police officer Mole, john doe, City Of New York, Dermot Shea, Police Officer Wnorowskisg and John Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv05762
Filed: July 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER IN 1983 CASE: The Courts August 11, 2021 Order scheduling an Initial Pretrial Conference in this 1983 case, Dkt. No. 3, was entered in error and is hereby vacated. This case shall be conducted in accordance with the Plan for Certain 1983 Cases Against the City of New York (Local Civil Rule 83.10, available at: https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/local_rules/rules- 2018-10-29.pdf). The parties are directed to follow these procedures - even to the extent that they are inconsistent with this Court's Individual Rules. Any timely application to exempt this case from the procedures set forth in the 1983 Plan or to refer this case to a magistrate judge for settlement purposes will be considered in due course. If the parties do not file a timely application to exempt the case from the 1983 Plan pursuant to paragraph 4.a of the 1983 Plan, the parties are directed to submit a joint letter to the Court no later than one hundred and twenty days after the first defendant files its answer. The joint letter shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: (1) A brief statement of the nature of the action and the principal defenses thereto; (2) A brief explanation of why jurisdiction and venue lie with this Court; (3) A brief description as to the status of the case in mediation and each party's position on whether an initial pre-trial conference should be scheduled; (4) Any other information that the parties believe may assist the Court in resolving this action. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the date of this order are directed (i) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this notice, the 1983 Plan, and the Courts Individual Rules (available at: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan) forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this notice must forthwith send a copy of the notice, 1983 Plan, and Individual Rules to that party personally. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/12/2021) (vfr)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/12/2021, Doc. #4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2021) (vfr) Modified on 8/12/2021 (vfr).
July 7, 2021 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
July 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Poupa Jenny Marashi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mayor Bill de Blasio, Mole, Sally Roes, Dermot Shea, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, Wnorowskisg, john doe, Justin E. Baerga. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Poupa Jenny Marashi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (pc)
July 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marashi, Poupa)
July 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mayor Bill de Blasio, Mole, Sally Roes, Dermot Shea, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, Wnorowskisg, john doe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24753738)Document filed by Justin E. Baerga..(Marashi, Poupa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baerga v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin E. Baerga
Represented By: Poupa Jenny Marashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisory Officers Sally Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wnorowskisg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: police officer Mole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: john doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Wnorowskisg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?