New York Marine And General Insurance Company v. Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Plaintiff: New York Marine And General Insurance Company
Defendant: Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 1:2021cv05820
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Gregory Adolfsen on behalf of New York Marine And General Insurance Company..(Adolfsen, Louis)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Quentin A. Alexandre on behalf of New York Marine And General Insurance Company..(Alexandre, Quentin)
July 20, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00804-SHS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 20, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case.(vba)
July 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London..(Rokuson, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-0804. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London..(Rokuson, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rokuson, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hiscox Ltd., Corporate Parent RiverStone Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent American Financial Group Inc, Corporate Parent GAI Indemnity Ltd., Corporate Parent Lavenham Underwriting Ltd., Corporate Parent Sampford Underwriting Ltd., Corporate Parent Neon Capital Limited, Corporate Parent GAI Holding Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent Aegis, Corporate Parent Riverstone Management, Ltd. for Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London..(Rokuson, Craig)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Sidney H. Stein as possibly related to 21-cv-804. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not properly signed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York Marine And General Insurance Company; Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Craig Lawrence Rokuson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-00804. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London..(Rokuson, Craig) Modified on 7/8/2021 (jgo).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group Inc., Corporate Parent Hiscox Ltd., Corporate Parent Neon Capital Limited, Corporate Parent Aegis for Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London..(Rokuson, Craig)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rokuson, Craig) Modified on 7/8/2021 (jgo).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653713/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24762732).Document filed by Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint).(Rokuson, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Marine And General Insurance Company v. Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Marine And General Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis Gregory Adolfsen
Represented By: Quentin A. Alexandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Rokuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?