New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO v. Life Hotel One LLC et al.
Plaintiff: New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Respondent: Life Hotel, Life Hotel One LLC, Life Hotel TIC LLC, Flabla LLC, Luxe Life Management, Liliha Herald TIC LLC and Luxe Life Hotel New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv05844
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Life Hotel NYC LLC on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Liliha Herald TIC LLC on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Life Hotel One LLC on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Luxe Life Management, Inc. on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Flabla LLC on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons, civil cover sheet, petition, declaration with exhibits, memorandum of law, rule 7.1 statement served on Life Hotel TIC LLC on 7/16/21. Service was accepted by Nancy Daugherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luxe Life Management, Flabla LLC, Life Hotel, Life Hotel One LLC, Life Hotel TIC LLC, Liliha Herald TIC LLC..(gp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bauman, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIFE HOTEL ONE LLC, FLABLA LLC, LIFE HOTEL TIC LLC, LILIHA HERALD TIC LLC, LUXE LIFE MANAGEMENT, and LIFE HOTEL a/k/a LUXE LIFE HOTEL NEW YORK, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Alan Bauman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LIFE HOTEL ONE LLC, FLABLA LLC, LIFE HOTEL TIC LLC, LILIHA HERALD TIC LLC, LUXE LIFE MANAGEMENT INC, and LIFE HOTEL a/k/a LUXE LIFE HOTEL NEW YORK, New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Alan Bauman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $680,322,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Alan Bauman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Alan Bauman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIFE HOTEL ONE LLC, FLABLA LLC, LIFE HOTEL TIC LLC, LILIHA HERALD TIC LLC, LUXE LIFE MANAGEMENT, and LIFE HOTEL a/k/a LUXE LIFE HOTEL NEW YORK, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael) Modified on 7/8/2021 (pc).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Bauman, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bauman, Michael) Modified on 7/8/2021 (pc).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24765241).Document filed by New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Supplement Brief in support).(Bauman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO v. Life Hotel One LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Life Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Life Hotel One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Life Hotel TIC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Flabla LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luxe Life Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Liliha Herald TIC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luxe Life Hotel New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Hotel & Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michael Alan Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?