Kioba Processing LLC v. TD Bank, N.A.
Defendant: TD Bank (USA), N.A. and TD Bank, N.A.
Counter Defendant: Kioba Processing LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv05862
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Corporate Parent TD Bank US Holding Company, Corporate Parent TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, N.A.. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A...(Flanz, Scott)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Michael A. Vincent to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-25020796. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Vincent, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Kioba Processing LLC. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A...(Flanz, Scott)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank for TD Bank, N.A.. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A...(Flanz, Scott) Modified on 9/3/2021 (lb).
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Bret T. Winterle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25019280. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Flanz, Scott)
September 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Michael Flanz on behalf of TD Bank, N.A...(Flanz, Scott)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Michael Flanz to RE-FILE Document #21 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jonathan H. Rastegar dated September 2, 2021 Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Griffin, Ryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC..(Griffin, Ryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #17) - WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TD Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC..(Conroy, Patrick) Modified on 7/20/2021 (ldi).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on September 10, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 5862. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. In their joint letter, the parties should indicate whether they believe a Rule 16 conference is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and have no objection to proceeding by teleconference; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and request it be adjourned until such time as it can be safely held in person. If the parties prefer an in-person conference, they should propose three mutually-agreed upon Fridays for the conference, although the Court does not guarantee it will honor the parties' preferred date. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/19/2021) (ama)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #12 Motion for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/16/2021) (ama)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #11 Motion for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/16/2021) (ama)
July 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Griffin, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu). Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu).
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu). Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu).
July 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Suprerme Court of Texas. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Griffin, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu).
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcu).
July 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #7 MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24784405..(Rastegar, Jonathan)
July 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #8 MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bcu)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ryan Paul Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Griffin, Ryan) Modified on 7/13/2021 (bcu).
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan Hart Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 7/13/2021 (bcu).
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rastegar, Jonathan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code b (Both); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TD Bank (USA), N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC..(Rastegar, Jonathan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rastegar, Jonathan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 7/9/2021 (jgo).
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TD Bank (USA), N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-24768176)Document filed by Kioba Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit).(Rastegar, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kioba Processing LLC v. TD Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kioba Processing LLC
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rastegar
Represented By: Ryan Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Vincent
Represented By: Scott Michael Flanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?