Tucker v. Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Henry Tucker
Defendant: Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. and C&F Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05892
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CRUM & FORSTER INSURANCE BROKERS, INC.: Plaintiff(s), HENRY TUCKER, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby dismisses the above entitled action against Defendant, CRUM & FORSTER INSURANCE BROKERS, INC., without prejudice and without fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Defendant Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., from this action. Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/26/2021) (cf)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.. Document filed by Henry Tucker. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(LaBollita, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. C&F Insurance Agency, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. Document filed by Henry Tucker..(LaBollita, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C&F Insurance Agency, Inc...(pc)
August 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lorna G. Schofield for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C&F Insurance Agency, Inc., re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Henry Tucker..(LaBollita, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., C&F Insurance Agency, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Henry Tucker. Related document: #1 Complaint..(LaBollita, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katelyn M. Sandoval on behalf of Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc...(Sandoval, Katelyn)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (Dkt. 7); Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. on 08/13/2021. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Henry Tucker..(LaBollita, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference by telephone set for 9/23/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. ( As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) (vfr)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, NYS SOS, Agent. Document filed by Henry Tucker..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc...(pc)
July 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Henry Tucker..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Henry Tucker..(LaBollita, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24770637)Document filed by Henry Tucker..(LaBollita, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tucker
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael A. LaBollita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn M. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&F Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?