Atax New York, Inc. et al v. Canela #1 et al
Plaintiff: Atax New York, Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc. and Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.
Defendant: Alcides Mendoza, Joel Canela #2 also known as Alcides Mendoza doing business as FI Consulting Services, Inc., Joel Canela #1, Canela, Sterling Mateo, Walber Lugo, Arcadio Consulting, Inc., FI Consulting Services, Inc. and Ingrid LaMarche
Case Number: 1:2021cv05916
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steven I.Brizel dated sEPTEMBER 5, 2021 re: extension of time. Document filed by Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of STERLING MATEO, INGRID LAMARCHE, WALBER LUGO in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo..(Fuld, Elliot)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AFFIRMATION of Elliot H. Fuld in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit alleged contract).(Fuld, Elliot)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo. Responses due by 9/8/2021.(Fuld, Elliot)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Elliot H. Fuld to RE-FILE Document #28 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Affidavit in Support of Motion and Affirmation in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .( Responses due by 9/8/2021) Document filed by Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation & statement of law, #2 Affidavit Defendants' Affidavit, #3 Exhibit "Employment Appointment Agreement").(Fuld, Elliot) Modified on 8/27/2021 (ldi).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER terminating #23 Letter Motion for Conference re: #23 LETTER MOTION for Conference to file dismissal motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from ELLIOT FULD dated 8/5/2021. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter-motion seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss, Dkt. 23, and Plaintiffs' response, Dkt. 25. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by August 25, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers by September 8, 2021. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by September 15, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/12/2021) (jca)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/25/2021. Responses due by 9/8/2021, Replies due by 9/15/2021. (jca)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #24 Letter filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the fact that Defendants' letter was not docketed until August 5, 2021, Plaintiffs shall have until August 10, 2021 to respond to Defendants' letter. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/9/2021) (js)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steven I.Brizel dated August 9, 2021 re: proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steven I.Brizel dated August 9, 2021 re: extension of time. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Conference to file dismissal motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from ELLIOT FULD dated 8/5/2021. Document filed by Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo..(Fuld, Elliot)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized agent Secretary of State. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Arcadio Consulting, Inc. served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized agent Secretary of State. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.; Atax Franchise,Inc.; Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elliot H. Fuld on behalf of Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo..(Fuld, Elliot)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alcides Mendoza served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.; Atax Franchise,Inc.; Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ingrid LaMarche served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.; Atax Franchise,Inc.; Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sterling Mateo served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.; Atax Franchise,Inc.; Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Walber Lugo served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.; Atax Franchise,Inc.; Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Joel Canela #1, Joel Canela #2, FI Consulting Services, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo, Alcides Mendoza..(gp)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ingrid LaMarche Joel Canela #1 Alcides Mendoza alias Joel Canela a/k/a Joel Canela #2 Sterling Mateo Ingrid LaMarche Walber Lugo Arcadia Consulting,Inc., FI Consulting,Inc. Joel Canela #2 a/k/a Alcides Mendoza d/b/a F1 Consulting Services, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brizel, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 COMPLAINT against Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Joel Canela #1, Joel Canela #2, FI Consulting Services, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche, Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo, Alcides Mendoza. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - (see Doc 14) - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joel Canela #1 Alcides Mendoza alias Joel Canela a/k/a Joel Canela #2 Sterling Mateo Ingrid LaMarche Walber Lugo Arcadia Consulting,Inc., FI Consulting,Inc. Joel Canela #2 a/k/a Alcides Mendoza d/b/a F1 Consulting Services, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/15/2021 (gp).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brizel, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - (see Doc 12) - COMPLAINT against Arcadio Consulting, Inc., Joel Canela #1, Joel Canela #2, FI Consulting Services, Inc., Walber Lugo, Sterling Mateo, Alcides Mendoza. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2021 (gp).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Brizel to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'As to' was not added to the case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Brizel to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. (ADD INGRID LaMARCHE) AND the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Ingrid LaMarche added. Party added pursuant to #9 Complaint,.Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc., Ingrid LaMarche. Related document: #9 Complaint,..(Brizel, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joel Canela #1 Alcides Mendoza alias Joel Canela a/k/a Joel Canela #2 Sterling Mateo Ingrid LaMarche Walber Lugo Arcadia Consulting,Inc., FI Consulting,Inc. Joel Canela #2 a/k/a Alcides Mendoza d/b/a F1 Consulting Services, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2021 (gp).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brizel, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2021 (gp).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Ira Brizel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $3,000,000; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Ira Brizel to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint, #4 Complaint, #2 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The complaint must be filed in its entirety as one document. Add Ingrid Lamarche to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Ira Brizel. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Ira Brizel to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Ingrid Lamarche to CM ECF and correctly refile the complaint;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joel Canela #1 Alcides Mendoza alias Joel Canela a/k/a Joel Canela #2 Sterling Mateo Ingrid LaMarche Walber Lugo Arcadia Consulting,Inc., FI Consulting,Inc. Joel Canela #2 a/k/a Alcides Mendoza d/b/a F1 Consulting Services, re: #1 Complaint, #4 Complaint, #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/12/2021 (pc).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24773373)Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/12/2021 (pc).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24773308)Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/12/2021 (pc).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24772590)Document filed by Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc., Atax Franchise,Inc., Atax New York, Inc...(Brizel, Steven) Modified on 7/12/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atax New York, Inc. et al v. Canela #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcides Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Canela #2 also known as Alcides Mendoza doing business as FI Consulting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Canela #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Mateo
Represented By: Elliot H. Fuld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walber Lugo
Represented By: Elliot H. Fuld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadio Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot H. Fuld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FI Consulting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid LaMarche
Represented By: Elliot H. Fuld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atax New York, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ira Brizel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atax Franchise,Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ira Brizel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atax Cloud Bookkeeping,Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ira Brizel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?