Wilson et al v. Mastercard Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Wilson and Michael Brofman
Defendant: Mastercard Inc. and MasterCard International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05930
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brianna Olivia Gallo on behalf of MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Gallo, Brianna)
August 16, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah Sands on behalf of MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Sands, Deborah)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicholas P. Crowell dated August 13, 2021., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. MasterCard International, Inc. answer due 10/18/2021; Mastercard Inc. answer due 10/18/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/13/2021) (ate)
August 13, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicholas P. Crowell dated August 13, 2021. Document filed by MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Crowell, Nicholas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mastercard Inc. for MasterCard International, Inc.. Document filed by MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Crowell, Nicholas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Primer Crowell on behalf of MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Crowell, Nicholas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kwaku Affawua Akowuah on behalf of MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Akowuah, Kwaku)
August 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamon Paul Joyce on behalf of MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(Joyce, Eamon)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/4/2021) (ate)
August 4, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24884075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24884075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Drake, Eleanor)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mastercard Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. Service was accepted by Leonara Lillie, Manager. Document filed by Tiffany Wilson; Michael Brofman..(Albanese, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. MasterCard International, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. Service was accepted by Leonara Lillie, Manager. Document filed by Tiffany Wilson; Michael Brofman..(Albanese, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Ariana Kiener to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/2/2021) (ate)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/2/2021) (ate)
July 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Ariana Kiener to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Ariana Kiener to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kiener, Ariana)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Albanese, John)
July 28, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Ariana Kiener to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24849642. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notary Number Missing;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 28, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24849544. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notary Number Missing;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ariana Kiener to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24849642. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kiener, Ariana) Modified on 7/28/2021 (vba).
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24849544. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Albanese, John) Modified on 7/28/2021 (vba).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on September 17, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 5930. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. In their joint letter, the parties should indicate whether they believe a Rule 16 conference is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and have no objection to proceeding by teleconference; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and request it be adjourned until such time as it can be safely held in person. If the parties prefer an in-person conference, they should propose three mutually-agreed upon Fridays for the conference, although the Court does not guarantee it will honor the parties' preferred date. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/20/2021) (ama)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc...(gp)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mastercard Inc and Mastercard International Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sharon Kunjumon Robertson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tiffany Wilson; Michael Brofman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sharon Kunjumon Robertson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sharon Kunjumon Robertson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mastercard Inc and Mastercard International Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Brofman, Tiffany Wilson..(Robertson, Sharon) Modified on 7/12/2021 (jgo).
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MasterCard International, Inc., Mastercard Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24776137)Document filed by Tiffany Wilson, Michael Brofman..(Robertson, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Mastercard Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Wilson
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Ariana Kiener
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brofman
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Ariana Kiener
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard Inc.
Represented By: Brianna Olivia Gallo
Represented By: Deborah Sands
Represented By: Eamon Paul Joyce
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: Nicholas Primer Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MasterCard International, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Primer Crowell
Represented By: Brianna Olivia Gallo
Represented By: Deborah Sands
Represented By: Eamon Paul Joyce
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?