Bayne et al v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Mieke Bayne and Alyssa Hart
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv05938
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Max Roberts dated September 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/02/2021) (ama)
September 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/19/2021. (ama)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Max Roberts dated September 1, 2021. Document filed by Mieke Bayne, Alyssa Hart..(Roberts, Max)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter filed by Target Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will inform the parties if oral argument is requested. Otherwise, the motion will be decided on the papers in due course. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/26/2021) (vfr)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David Carrier dated 08/24/2021 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Carrier, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Target Corporation..(Carrier, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of David Carrier in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Carrier, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Target Corporation. Responses due by 9/7/2021.(Carrier, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alan Mark Beyer on behalf of Target Corporation..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for David J. Carrier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
August 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for David J. Carrier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-24906478. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for David J. Carrier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-24906478. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of David Carrier in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Carrier, David)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/29/2021) (vfr)
July 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Target Corporation answer due 8/24/2021. (vfr)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew A. Beyer dated July 27, 2021. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Beyer, Matthew)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Target Corporation served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. Service was accepted by Cathy Prescher, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent. Document filed by Mieke Bayne; Alyssa Hart..(Roberts, Max)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roberts, Max)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Target Corporation..(jgo)
July 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Max Stuart Roberts. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,001,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Max Stuart Roberts to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin code was not selected; Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes must only be selected when Diversity Basis of Jurisdiction code is selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TARGET CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mieke Bayne, Alyssa Hart..(Roberts, Max)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roberts, Max) Modified on 7/12/2021 (jgo).
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24777003)Document filed by Mieke Bayne, Alyssa Hart..(Roberts, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayne et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mieke Bayne
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Hart
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: David J. Carrier
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mark Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?