Jatin Chopra v. Didi Global Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jatin Chopra
Defendant: Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, Zhiyi Chen, Will Wei Cheng, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Adria Perica, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Daniel Yong Zhang, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Alan Yue Zhuo, Didi Global Inc. and Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05973
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: Defendant is not obligated to respond to the Complaint filed in this action at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/2/2021) (kv)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Uber International C.V.,, Other Affiliate SVF XKI Subco (Singapore) Pte Ltd. for Didi Global Inc.. Document filed by Didi Global Inc...(Worcester, Richard)
September 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Corey Worcester to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renita Sharma on behalf of Didi Global Inc...(Sharma, Renita)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Didi Global Inc...(Worcester, Richard)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Didi Global Inc...(Worcester, Richard) Modified on 9/2/2021 (lb).
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Corey Worcester on behalf of Didi Global Inc...(Worcester, Richard)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Didi Global Inc. served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. Service was accepted by Fidan Hasanbayli of Cognency Global, Inc., Registered Agent. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
August 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (aea)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campisi, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adria Perica, Alan Yue Zhuo, Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Daniel Yong Zhang, Didi Global Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Will Wei Cheng, Zhiyi Chen..(jgo)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not properly signed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jatin Chopra; Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly related to 21-cv-5807. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/13/2021 (jgo).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.,Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, Zhiyi Chen, Will Wei Cheng, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Adria Perica, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Daniel Yong Zhang, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, and Alan Yue Zhuo, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campisi, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/13/2021 (jgo).
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adria Perica, Alan Yue Zhuo, Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Daniel Yong Zhang, Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Will Wei Cheng, Zhiyi Chen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24782982)Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jatin Chopra v. Didi Global Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jatin Chopra
Represented By: Jeffrey Philip Campisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boci Asia Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bocom International Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCB International Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLSA Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMB International Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Wei Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futu Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICBC International Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Qing Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentaro Matsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria Perica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Chi Ping Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Yong Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Jingshi Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Yue Zhuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Didi Global Inc.
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?