Silverblatt et al v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Howard Silverblatt and Rebecca Silverblatt
Defendant: Kiarah Edwards and Vivian Edwards
Case Number: 1:2021cv05989
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kiarah Edwards, Vivian Edwards..(pc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kiarah Edwards, Vivian Edwards, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Howard Silverblatt, Rebecca Silverblatt..(Verchick, Glenn)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kiarah Edwards, Vivian Edwards. Document filed by Howard Silverblatt, Rebecca Silverblatt..(Verchick, Glenn)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Glenn Verchick to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Glenn Verchick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1333; Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Arbitration code m (Mandatory); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Glenn Verchick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: rebecca silevrblatt. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Verchick, Glenn)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24786204)Document filed by howard silverblatt, rebecca silevrblatt..(Verchick, Glenn) Modified on 7/14/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverblatt et al v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Silverblatt
Represented By: Glenn Verchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Silverblatt
Represented By: Glenn Verchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiarah Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?