Ferreira et al v. Porter et al
Plaintiff: Justine Ferreira
Defendant: Meisha Porter and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv06012
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Sharon Sprayregen dated September 10, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter..(Sprayregen, Sharon)
September 10, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John Henry Olthoff dated 09/10/2021 re: Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually), Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By September 10, 2021, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/11/2021) (ate)
August 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York City Department of Education answer due 9/10/2021. (ate)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on consent addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Sharon Sprayregen dated August 10, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter..(Sprayregen, Sharon)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Vicky Sprayregen on behalf of New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter..(Sprayregen, Sharon)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Department of Education served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021; Meisha Porter served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually); Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter..(jgo)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually), Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John)
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Henry Olthoff to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers must be selected for one filing; do not file a separate summons with the same information for each filer;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/20/2021 (jgo).
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually)..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/20/2021 (jgo).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b )( 4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b )(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discove1y through remote means at eve1y available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by September 13, 2021, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by September 13, 2021, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 16, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-09849-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Olthoff to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons and #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the TO section of the PDF does not match the name entered on the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/15/2021 (gp).
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually)..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/15/2021 (gp).
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-CV-09849. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.)..(Olthoff, John)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-CV-09849. Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually)..(Olthoff, John)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Henry Olthoff, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Henry Olthoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code M 22-1 Designation by U.S. Attorney of individual to accept service of summons and complaint; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 20:1401; the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Henry Olthoff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Justine Ferreira. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Henry Olthoff to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
July 14, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 20cv9849. (pc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olthoff, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Meisha Porter..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/14/2021 (pc).
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEISHA PORTER, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Olthoff, John) Modified on 7/14/2021 (pc).
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24788550)Document filed by Justine Ferreira(Individually), Justine Ferreira(As Parent and Natural Guardian of N.R.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOFD in Case No. 185178, #2 Exhibit SRO Decision 21-063).(Olthoff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreira et al v. Porter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Ferreira
Represented By: John Henry Olthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meisha Porter
Represented By: Sharon Vicky Sprayregen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Sharon Vicky Sprayregen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?