AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A. v. Bank of China Limited et al
Plaintiff: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.
Defendant: Bank of China Limited, China Development Bank, Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, International Finance Corporation, KfW and Portigon AG, New York Branch
Case Number: 1:2021cv06020
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Referring Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lanier Saperstein on behalf of Bank of China Limited..(Saperstein, Lanier)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Steven J. Fink dated September 1, 2021. Application Granted. Portigon AG, New York Branch answer due 11/3/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/01/2021) (ama)
September 1, 2021 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Steven J. Fink dated September 1, 2021. Document filed by Portigon AG, New York Branch..(Fink, Steven)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/21) (yv)
August 25, 2021 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NRW Bank for Portigon AG, New York Branch. Document filed by Portigon AG, New York Branch..(Fink, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven J. Fink on behalf of Portigon AG, New York Branch..(Fink, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 41 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated August 25, 2021. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Perry, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dexia SA/NV for Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch. Document filed by Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Perry, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, September 3, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/9/2021) (kv)
August 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 6, 2021 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated August 6, 2021 re: Response to #36 Letter re: Related Cases. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel M. Perry dated August 5, 2021 re: Related Cases. Document filed by Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Perry, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel M. Perry dated August 4, 2021. Application GRANTED. However, no further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint,. Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch answer due 11/3/2021; KfW answer due 11/3/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/5/2021) (vfr)
August 4, 2021 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel M. Perry dated August 4, 2021. Document filed by Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Perry, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mumford Perry on behalf of Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Perry, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Bonelli on behalf of Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Bonelli, Alison)
August 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Lees on behalf of Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, KfW..(Lees, Alexander)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel P. Goldberger dated August 3, 2021., #1 Complaint. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Bank of China's letter motion dated August 3, 2021, requesting a 90-day extension of its answer deadline (Dkt. #27), as well as Plaintiff's above response (Dkt. #28). Bank of China's application is GRANTED. Its answer shall be filed on or before November 3, 2021. No further extensions will be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 27. Bank of China Limited answer due 11/3/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/4/2021) (rro)
August 4, 2021 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bank of China Limited..(Goldberger, Daniel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 28 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated August 3, 2021 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel P. Goldberger dated August 3, 2021. . Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 3, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel P. Goldberger dated August 3, 2021. Document filed by Bank of China Limited..(Goldberger, Daniel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Poul Goldberger on behalf of Bank of China Limited..(Goldberger, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Portigon AG, New York Branch served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. Service was accepted by Joseph Mullaly, Compliance Officer. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. KfW served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Greg Lavelle, Designated Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. Service was accepted by Scott Seamon, Director and Associate Counsel. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bank of China Limited served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Ying Pan, Associate. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Hetherington on behalf of AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Hetherington, Andrew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of China Limited..(gp)
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of China Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Schahin Holding S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Engenharia S.A., Other Affiliate Base Engenharia E Servicos de Petroleo E Gas S.A. f/k/a Schahin Engenharia S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Empreendimentos Imobiliarios LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Desenvolvimento Imobiliario S.A., Other Affiliate Companhia Schahin de Ativos, Other Affiliate MTS Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Satasch Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Deep Black Drilling LLP, Other Affiliate Agropecuaria Alto do Turiassu LTDA, Other Affiliate Agropecuari Maranhense S.A. - Agromasa, Other Affiliate Ambar Empreendimentos E Participacoes S/C LTDA, Other Affiliate Aquatica Comunicacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Companhia MS de Participacoes, Other Affiliate Companhia Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S/S LTDA, Other Affiliate Construtora Mogno LTDA, Other Affiliate Foxborough Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Habitecnica Participacoes S.A., Other Affiliate HBF Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Intelis Automacao e Controle LTDA, Other Affiliate S&S Holding Eletrica S.A., Other Affiliate S2 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH07 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH08 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH13 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH14 Sondas de Producoes Maritimas S.A., Other Affiliate SCH15 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Administracao e Informatica LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Ativos Companhia Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Capital SPE 1 S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Capital SPE 2 S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Base Petroleo e Gas S.A. f/k/a Schahin Petroleo e Gas S.A., Other Affiliate S.M. Participacoes S.A., Other Affiliate HHS Participacoes S.A., Other Affiliate Habitecnica S.A. Empreendimentos Imobiliarios, Administracao e Planejamento for AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portigon AG, New York Branch..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KfW..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KfW..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to International Finance Corporation..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to China Development Bank..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Edward Goldsmith to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
July 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew Edward Goldsmith to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text and the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption and must not be abbreviated;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of China Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew) Modified on 7/14/2021 (jgo).
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to China Development Bank, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to International Finance Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KfW, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KfW, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Portigon AG, New York Branch, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew) Modified on 7/14/2021 (ldi).
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldsmith, Andrew) Modified on 7/14/2021 (jgo).
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of China Limited, China Development Bank, Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch, International Finance Corporation, KfW, Portigon AG, New York Branch. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24789141)Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A. v. Bank of China Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Andrew M. Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of China Limited
Represented By: Daniel Poul Goldberger
Represented By: Lanier Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Development Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexia Credit Local SA, New York Branch
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KfW
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portigon AG, New York Branch
Represented By: Steven J. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?