Davis v. Barefoot Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Davis
Defendant: Barefoot Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06057
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barefoot Sciences, Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was accepted by Jennifer Wrightley, Cogency Global, Inc.. Document filed by Kevin Davis..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b )( 4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b )(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 13, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barefoot Sciences, Inc...(jgo)
July 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barefoot Sciences, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Davis..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barefoot Sciences, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24796279)Document filed by Kevin Davis..(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Barefoot Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Davis
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barefoot Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?