Federal Election Commission v. LatPAC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Election Commission
Defendant: LatPAC and Chalin M. Askew
Case Number: 1:2021cv06095
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 02 U.S.C. ยง 437
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chalin M. Askew waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Ward, Haven)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. LatPAC waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Ward, Haven)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #2 Motion for Harry J. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Harry J. Summers is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/3/2021) (rj)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chalin M. Askew. (vf)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LatPAC. (vf)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chalin Askew, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Ward, Haven)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LatPAC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Ward, Haven)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Haven G Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons must be filed separately. Or you can use one summons form and list each party on a separate rider.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LatPAC; Chalin Askew, Treasurer of LatPAC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Ward, Haven) Modified on 7/22/2021 (pc).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Kevin Deeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kevin Deeley is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/21/2021) (rj)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Haven G. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Haven G. Ward is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/21/2021) (rj)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Kevin Deeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #4 MOTION for Haven G. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Kevin Deeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit MA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Deeley, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Haven G. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit MA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Ward, Haven)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #2 MOTION for Harry J. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Attorneys for the Federal Election Commission).(Summers, Harry)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Harry J. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Summers, Harry)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chalin M. Askew, LatPAC. Document filed by Federal Election Commission..(Summers, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Election Commission v. LatPAC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Election Commission
Represented By: Haven G Ward
Represented By: Kevin Deeley
Represented By: Harry Jacobs Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LatPAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chalin M. Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?