Warnes et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Warnes and Rachel Warnes
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06111
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
August 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 23, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Document filed by Rachel Warnes, Robert Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Luhana, Roopal)
August 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Roopal Premchand Luhana, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vba)
July 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (aea)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(jgo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(jgo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(jgo)
July 19, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Roopal Premchand Luhana to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the full related case number number must be listed on the docket entry text and the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
July 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Roopal Premchand Luhana to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the full related case number is not on the PDF; Jury Demand code was not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) Modified on 7/19/2021 (jgo).
July 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to MDL No. 2859. Document filed by Rachel Warnes, Robert Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal) Modified on 7/19/2021 (jgo).
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rachel Warnes, Robert Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rachel Warnes, Robert Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rachel Warnes, Robert Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Luhana, Roopal) Modified on 7/19/2021 (jgo).
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24804214)Document filed by Robert Warnes, Rachel Warnes..(Luhana, Roopal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warnes et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Warnes
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Warnes
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?