Kohari et al v. MetLife Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rita Kohari, John Radolec and Mohani Jaikaran
Defendant: MetLife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee and John and Jane Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv06146
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants request is granted. Defendants shall answer, or otherwise respond to, the Complaint by September 30, 2021.The previously scheduled initial pretrial conference will go forward on October 5, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/18/2021) (tg)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.), Set/Reset Deadlines: Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee answer due 9/30/2021; MetLife Group, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2021. (tg)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jeffrey B. Korn dated August 17, 2021. Document filed by Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee, MetLife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company..(Korn, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Grace Irene Chanin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Brock Joseph Specht to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Kai Heinrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Service of Process Specialist. Document filed by Rita Kohari; Mohani Jaikaran; John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Service of Process Specialist. Document filed by Rita Kohari; Mohani Jaikaran; John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MetLife Group, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Service of Process Specialist. Document filed by Rita Kohari; Mohani Jaikaran; John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Grace Irene Chanin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Brock Joseph Specht to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839679. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Kai Heinrich Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Grace Irene Chanin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Grace I. Chanin, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Chanin, Grace)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Brock Joseph Specht to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839679. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brock J. Specht, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Specht, Brock)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Kai Heinrich Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24839628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kai H. Richter, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Richter, Kai)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/21/2021) (nb)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MetLife Group, Inc...(pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company..(pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee..(pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul Lukas. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John and Jane Does, Metroplitan Life Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mohani Jaikaran, Rita Kohari, John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lukas, Paul)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee, John and Jane Does, MetLife Group, Inc., Metroplitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24810975)Document filed by Rita Kohari, Mohani Jaikaran, John Radolec..(Lukas, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohari et al v. MetLife Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Kohari
Represented By: Paul Lukas
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Grace Chanin
Represented By: Kai Heinrich Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Radolec
Represented By: Paul Lukas
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Grace Chanin
Represented By: Kai Heinrich Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohani Jaikaran
Represented By: Paul Lukas
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Grace Chanin
Represented By: Kai Heinrich Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Plans Investment Advisory Committee
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?