General Electric International, Inc. et al v. Thorco Shipping America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: General Electric International, Inc. and General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)
Defendant: Thorco Shipping America, Inc. and Thorco Projects A/S
Case Number: 1:2021cv06154
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Thorco Projects A/S waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Document filed by General Electric International, Inc.; General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Thorco Shipping America, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Document filed by General Electric International, Inc.; General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/21/2021) (nb)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thorco Projects A/S..(pc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thorco Shipping America, Inc...(pc)
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Casey M O'Brien. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thoco Projects A/S. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Casey M O'Brien. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THORCO PROJECTS A/S, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by General Electric International, Inc., General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THORCO SHIPPING AMERICA, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by General Electric International, Inc., General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Brien, Casey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY for General Electric International, Inc., General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA). Document filed by General Electric International, Inc., General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thoco Projects A/S, Thorco Shipping America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24812053)Document filed by General Electric International, Inc., General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)..(O'Brien, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Electric International, Inc. et al v. Thorco Shipping America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Electric International, Inc.
Represented By: Casey M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Electric International, Inc. Taiwan Branch (USA)
Represented By: Casey M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorco Shipping America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorco Projects A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?