Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Relias Learning LLC
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Relias Learning LLC dba Continuingeducation.com and Relias Learning LLC doing business as Continuingeducation.com
Case Number: 1:2021cv06229
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Hoffman dated 08/16/2021. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Relias Learning LLC answer due 9/30/2021 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/2021) (jca)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Hoffman dated 08/16/2021. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Return Date set for 9/30/2021 at 05:00 PM..(Hoffman, David)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Relias Learning LLC served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was accepted by Judy Carkner. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/23/2021) (nb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Relias Learning LLC..(pc)
July 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Relias Learning LLC dba Continuingeducation.com. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Relias Learning LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Relias Learning LLC dba Continuingeducation.com. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24825030)Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US7299067).(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Relias Learning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relias Learning LLC dba Continuingeducation.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relias Learning LLC doing business as Continuingeducation.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?