Kakish v. Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon et al
Plaintiff: Ramzi Kakish
Defendant: Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon and Carolyn Strudwick
Case Number: 1:2021cv06264
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Ramzi Kakish 166 East 34th Street Apt. 16G New York, NY 10016, at, on 9/7/2021 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, Order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon, Carolyn Strudwick. (aan)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 1, at 9.) The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon and Carolyn Strudwick, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. (As further set forth in this Order.) USM-285 Form due by 10/7/2021. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 10/7/2021. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/7/2021) (cf) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/7/2021) (cf)
September 7, 2021 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 9/7/2021 Re: Judge Edgardo Ramos #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Amended Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon, Carolyn Strudwick. (aan)
September 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
September 3, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon, Carolyn Strudwick amending #2 Complaint.Document filed by Ramzi Kakish. Related document: #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(sc)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-6264 (LTS). An Amended Complaint for Employment Discrimination form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 2, at 9.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/17/2021) (sac)
August 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/27/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon, Carolyn Strudwick. Document filed by Ramzi Kakish. (sac)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ramzi Kakish. (sac)
July 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kakish v. Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramzi Kakish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streetwork Project, Safe Horizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Strudwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?