Wang v. New York City Department of Youth and Community Development et al
Plaintiff: Xue Shan Wang
Defendant: New York City Department of Youth and Community Development, City of New York, Nevita Bailey, Lisa Thornton and Ardis Sanmoogan
Case Number: 1:2021cv06271
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order; Individual Rules served on Xue Shan Wang on September 16, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Nevita Bailey, City of New York, New York City Department of Youth and Community Development, Ardis Sanmoogan, Lisa Thornton..(DiBenedetto, Rachel)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: To be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/15/2021) (jca)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto on behalf of Nevita Bailey, City of New York, New York City Department of Youth and Community Development, Ardis Sanmoogan, Lisa Thornton..(DiBenedetto, Rachel)
September 9, 2021 Mailed a copy of #13 Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, to Xue Shan Wang 189 Bay 22nd Street Apt. 1R Brooklyn, NY 11214. (aan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER from Xue Wang, dated 9/8/21 re: I am writing this letter to ask the Court to mail me a copy of the mediation order which was issued on or about 8/14/21 or 8/15/21, concerning the defendants' attorney's request for an extension with the Court and the approval by the Court. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang.(sc)
September 8, 2021 Request for Copy of order Received: Re #23 Letter,. Request for copy of mediation referal order issued 8/12/21 from Xue Wang received on 9/8/21. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. By October 1, 2021, Defendants DYCD, the City of New York, Lisa Thornton and Ardis Sanmoogan shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/2/2021) (kv)
September 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York answer due 10/1/2021; New York City Department of Youth and Community Development answer due 10/1/2021; Ardis Sanmoogan answer due 10/1/2021; Lisa Thornton answer due 10/1/2021. (kv)
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Youth and Community Development, Ardis Sanmoogan, Lisa Thornton..(DiBenedetto, Rachel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto on behalf of Ardis Sanmoogan, Lisa Thornton..(DiBenedetto, Rachel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto on behalf of City of New York, New York City Department of Youth and Community Development..(DiBenedetto, Rachel)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York; served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service was accepted by Ariton Marke, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ardis Sanmoogan, NYC Dept. of Youth & Community Development; served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service was accepted by Ardis Sanmoogan. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nevita Bailey; served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service was accepted by Ardis Sanmoogan. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Youth and Community Development;served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service was accepted by Latrisha Desrosiers, Deputy Gen. Counsel. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lisa Thornton; served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service was accepted by Ardis Sanmoogan. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this order to pro se Plaintiff...this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation. Local Rule 83.12 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case....that the Clerk of Court shall locate pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff at the mediation. The time to assign a mediator under Local Rule 83.12(f) shall be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent the plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process....that any objection by the plaintiff to either the mediation or to the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this Order. In the event the plaintiff files such an objection, the referral to mediation is vacated, and this case will not proceed to mediation. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Youth and Community Development. (aan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (aan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ardis Sanmoogan. (aan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lisa Thornton. (aan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nevita Bailey. (aan)
August 4, 2021 Mailed a copy of #9 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued, #8 Summons Issued, #11 Summons Issued, #10 Summons Issued to Xue Shan Wang 189 Bay 22nd Street Apt. 1R Brooklyn, NY 11214. (aan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Dept. of Youth & Community Development Office of Legal Affairs, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ardis Sanmoogan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc) (sc).
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Thornton, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nevitq Bailey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #3 Request for Issuance of Summons to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 3, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
July 28, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check $402 processed by the Finance Department on 7/28/2021, Receipt Number 465401283537. (jcf)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nevita Bailey, City of New York, New York City Department of Youth and Community Development, Ardis Sanmoogan, Lisa Thornton. Document filed by Xue Shan Wang. (sac)
July 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. New York City Department of Youth and Community Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xue Shan Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Youth and Community Development
Represented By: Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevita Bailey
Represented By: Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Thornton
Represented By: Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardis Sanmoogan
Represented By: Rachel Michelle DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?