Jobah et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Essimail Jobah and EZ Oxford Deli Grocery Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture and United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv06335
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 202
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PLAINTIFFS' DISQUALIFICATION FROM THE SUPPLEMENTAL NUTRITION ASSISTANGE PROGRAM PENDING FINAL DISPOSITION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED, AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and the USDA, by their respective undersigned attorneys, that: The USDA agrees to stay its July 7, 2021 decision disqualifying Plaintiffs from participating in SNAP during the pendency of this action ("the STAY"), without prejudice to USDA's right to move to vacate the Stay upon further case development or changed circumstances. The Stay will be in effect until during the duration of any appeals. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/11/2021) (ama)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Weinreb, Carly)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carly Iris Weinreb on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Weinreb, Carly)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, October 15, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. The call-in information for all teleconferences is:Dial-in: (888) 363-4749. Access Code: 3667981. (Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/2/2021) (rro)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(pc)
July 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Agriculture. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 07:2023(a); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by EZ Oxford Deli Grocery Inc., Ahmed Essimail Jobah..(Berkowitz, Jess)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24841079)Document filed by Ahmed Essimail Jobah, EZ Oxford Deli Grocery Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 10/1/2019, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 10/7/2019, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 5/4/2021, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 5/10/2021, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jobah et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Essimail Jobah
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZ Oxford Deli Grocery Inc.
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carly Iris Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Represented By: Carly Iris Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?