Dos Santos v. Assurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andreia Rosa Dos Santos
Defendant: Assurant, Inc., Falcon Shield Property Preservation, LLC and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2021cv06368
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Mailed a copy of #6 Order 30 Days Other (case opening) to Andreia Rosa Dos Santos at 507 W 28th Street, Apt. 611, New York, NY 10001-5845. (kh)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff brings this action pro se. By order dated August 17, 2021, Plaintiff was granted thirty days' leave to file a declaration in response to the Court's order to show cause. (ECF 4.) On September 17, 2021, the Court received Plaintiff's request for an extension of time file a declaration. (ECF 5.) The Court grants Plaintiff's request. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may file a declaration. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/17/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from A. Dos Santos, dated 9/16/21 re: "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE" - I write to request an extension of time from the original due date of 9/17/21 to the new deadlind of 10/17/21 to file my Declaration. I ask for this extension because I received the Order to Show Cause one week after I filed; and I need more time to gather information and submit my Declaration. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(sc)
August 18, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order 30 Days Other (case opening) to Andreia Rosa Dos Santos at 507 W 28th Street, Apt. 611, New York, NY 10001-5845. (kh)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a written declaration, within 30 days, showing cause why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of Plaintiff's state law claims and any reason why her state law claim is not time-barred. For Plaintiff's convenience, a declaration form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff submits a declaration, it should be labeled with docket number 21-CV-6368 (LTS). No summons shall issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, or if her responses are insufficient, the complaint will be dismissed as set forth in this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/17/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Assurant, Inc., Does 1 through 5, Falcon Shield Property Preservation, LLC. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit).(rdz)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(rdz)
July 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dos Santos v. Assurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreia Rosa Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Shield Property Preservation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?