Williams v. Venture Tours, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Williams
Defendant: Venture Tours, Inc. and Russell C Weaver
Case Number: 1:2021cv06411
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jason Firestein in Support re: #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Jacqueline Williams..(Firestein, Jason)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court., #6 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court on the grounds that removal was untimely. . Document filed by Venture Tours, Inc., Russell C Weaver..(Rozenfeld, Jenya)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Jenya Rozenfeld, Esq. in Opposition re: #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court., #6 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court on the grounds that removal was untimely.. Document filed by Venture Tours, Inc., Russell C Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal with exhibits, #2 Exhibit Combined Discovery Demands, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's BP and Response to Discovery Demands, #4 Exhibit Email with Plaintiffs Demand).(Rozenfeld, Jenya)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court. . Document filed by Jacqueline Williams..(Firestein, Jason)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jason Firestein in Support re: #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Jacqueline Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Demands, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit State Court Orders).(Firestein, Jason)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Jacqueline Williams..(Firestein, Jason)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jason Stuart Firestein to RE-FILE Document #6 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court on the grounds that removal was untimely. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court on the grounds that removal was untimely. Document filed by Jacqueline Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Demands dated March 11, 2021, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Responses dated March 15, 2021, #5 Exhibit State Court orders).(Firestein, Jason) Modified on 8/18/2021 (ldi).
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Stuart Firestein on behalf of Jacqueline Williams..(Firestein, Jason)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John L. Tarnowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Accompanying Documents served on Zlotolow & Associates on July 29, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Venture Tours, Inc., Russell C Weaver..(Tarnowski, John)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tarnowski, John)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Venture Tours, Inc...(Tarnowski, John)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 34163/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24851476).Document filed by Russell C Weaver, Venture Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Response to Damages).(Tarnowski, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Venture Tours, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Williams
Represented By: Jason Stuart Firestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Tours, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Tarnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell C Weaver
Represented By: John L. Tarnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?