Alsadi et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Wasel Alsadi, NY2 Food Market Corp, Ebrahim Shaiban, Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp., Campus Grill Deli Corp. and Anis Hussain
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv06467
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #2 Motion for Joseph A. Bahgat to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to its local rules, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/20/2021) (kv)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(jgo)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food & Nutrition Service, re: #8 Complaint,,. Document filed by Wasel Alsadi, Campus Grill Deli Corp., Anis Hussain, Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp., NY2 Food Market Corp, Ebrahim Shaiban..(Bahgat, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. Document filed by Ebrahim Shaiban, Campus Grill Deli Corp., NY2 Food Market Corp, Anis Hussain, Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp., Wasel Alsadi. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Plaintiff, #2 Decl. of Plaintiff, #3 Decl. of Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit 1 - Charge Letter, #5 Exhibit 2 - Charge Letter, #6 Exhibit 3 - Charge Letter, #7 Exhibit 4 - Final Determination, #8 Exhibit 5 - Final Determination).(Bahgat, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food & Nutrition Service, re: #5 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Wasel Alsadi, Campus Grill Deli Corp., Anis Hussain, Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp., NY2 Food Market Corp, Ebrahim Shaiban..(Bahgat, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph A. Bahgat to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; You must fix the deficiency and correctly file the Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
August 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph A. Bahgat to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bahgat, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America.Document filed by NY2 Food Market Corp, Wasel Alsadi, Ebrahim Shaiban, Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp., Campus Grill Deli Corp., Anis Hussain. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Plaintiff, #2 Decl. of Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 1 - Charge Letter, #4 Exhibit 2 - Charge Letter, #5 Exhibit 3 - Charge Letter, #6 Exhibit 4 - Final Determination, #7 Exhibit 5 - Final Determination, #8 Exhibit 6).(Bahgat, Joseph) Modified on 8/6/2021 (sj).
August 5, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Wasel Alsadi, NY2 Food Market Corp. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Bahgat, Joseph)
July 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #2 MOTION for Joseph A. Bahgat to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24865055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph A. Bahgat to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading (United States of America) were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
July 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph A. Bahgat. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: USDA Food and Nutrition Service, Wasel Alsadi, NY2 Food Market Corp. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
July 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph A. Bahgat. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Cause of Action code 07:2011 Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 07:2023(a) Judicial Review of Food Stamp Disqualification. (vf)
July 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bahgat, Joseph)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bahgat, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2021 (vf).
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Joseph A. Bahgat to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24865055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wasel Alsadi, NY2 Food Market Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Bahgat, Joseph)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against USDA Food and Nutrition Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24865004)Document filed by Wasel Alsadi, NY2 Food Market Corp. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 1 - Charge Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Investigative Reports, #4 Exhibit 3 - Final Determination).(Bahgat, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsadi et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wasel Alsadi
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NY2 Food Market Corp
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebrahim Shaiban
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiwi Valley Deli & Grocery Corp.
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campus Grill Deli Corp.
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anis Hussain
Represented By: Joseph A. Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?