Ebalu v. New York City Police Department
Plaintiff: Poindexter O. Ebalu
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv06476
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 09/14/2021, Receipt Number 465401285810. (bwi)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is denied because Plaintiff has sufficient assets to pay the fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Plaintiff is directed to pay $402.00 in fees a $350.00 filing fee and a $52.00 administrative fee within 30 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this case. (ECF No. 3.) Filing Fee due by 10/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/8/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Poindexter O. Ebalu.(sc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an AMENDED IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 9/20/2021. AMENDED In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2021) (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 20, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Poindexter O. Ebalu consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Poindexter O. Ebalu. (sac)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against New York City Police Department. Document filed by Poindexter O. Ebalu. (sac)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Poindexter O. Ebalu. (sac)
July 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebalu v. New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poindexter O. Ebalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?