Jourdain v. Guard Management Service Corp.
Plaintiff: Guy Jourdain
Defendant: Guard Management Service Corporation and Guard Management Service Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06477
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION:THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE to the following: 1. The parties agree to submit this matter to mediation pursuant to the Agreement and Protocol between the Realty Advisory Board on Labor Relations and Local 32B, Service Employees International Union ("the Protocol"). Defendant shall bear the cost of the mediation. 2. This action shall be stayed pending the completion of the mediation, and defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond shall be extended until IO days following the conclusion of the mediation. The parties shall notify the Court upon conclusion of the mediation as to whether the matter has been settled or the action will proceed before the Court. 3. Defendant waives the Bypass Notice requirement contained in the Protocol. Defendant further waives any statute-of-limitations defense with regard to any provisions in the Protocol or with regard to any actions that may need to be taken henceforth with respect to the Protocol. None of the parties waive any legal position with regard to the mandatory arbitrability of the claims in the complaint under the Protocol. Granted. SO ORDERED., Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/26/21) (rj)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Guy Jourdain..(Pepper, Joshua)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED that defendant Guard Management Service Corp. acknowledges receipt, and waives any objection to service, of the Summons and Complaint, and that its time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint is hereby extended to and including October 12, 2021. This Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and facsimile or e-mail copies of this Stipulation and the signatures contained hereon shall be deemed to be originals for this purpose only. Granted. SO ORDERED. Guard Management Service Corp. answer due 10/12/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/16/2021) (vfr)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Guard Management Service Corp...(Goldberg, Jerrold)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guard Management Service Corp...(pc)
August 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Benjamin Pepper. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Guard Management Service Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
August 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Benjamin Pepper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guard Management Service Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Guy Jourdain..(Pepper, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pepper, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guard Management Service Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24866986)Document filed by Guy Jourdain..(Pepper, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jourdain v. Guard Management Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Jourdain
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Management Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Management Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?