Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca v. Magnitude Drywall Taping
Petitioner: Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca
Respondent: Magnitude Drywall Taping and Magnitude Drywall Finishers Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06481
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order served on Magnitude Drywall Taping a/k/a Magnitude Drywall Finishers Corp. on 9/10/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On July 30, 2021, Petitioners brought the instant petition to confirm their arbitration award. Doc. 1. Petitioners served Respondent on August 3, 2021. Doc. 7. Respondent has not appeared in this action to date. On September 9, 2021, Petitioners moved for summary judgment. Docs. 8-12. The briefing schedule for Petitioners' motion for summary judgment is set as follows: Respondent's opposition, if any, is due October 8, 2021; Petitioners' reply is due October 22, 2021. Petitioners are directed to serve a copy of this Order on Respondent by September 13, 2021. ( Responses due by 10/8/2021, Replies due by 10/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/10/2021) (cf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summary Judgment served on Magnitude Drywall Taping a/k/a Magnitude Drywall Finishers Corp. on 9/9/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of John Drew in Support re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition served on Magnitude Drywall Taping on 8/3/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Magnitude Drywall Taping. (sj)
August 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugielska, Lauren)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B- CBA, #3 Exhibit C- Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit E- Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Magnitude Drywall Taping a/k/a Magnitude Drywall Finishers Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca..(Kugielska, Lauren)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24867953).Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Memorandum of Law).(Kugielska, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca v. Magnitude Drywall Taping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Magnitude Drywall Taping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Magnitude Drywall Finishers Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO and Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Loca
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?