Guzman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Olvin Castro Guzman
Defendant: Commmissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv06538
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Referring Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Olvin Castro Guzman..(Latham, Christopher)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASE: This case has been referred to me for a report and recommendation. Plaintiff, who is represented by counsel, has brought this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking review of a denial of social security disability benefits. This Order supersedes all prior scheduling orders in this action. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file proof of service within 90 days after filing the complaint pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply with these requirements may result in the dismissal of this case. The parties shall advise the Court as to whether they jointly consent to decision of this action by a United States Magistrate Judge (that is, the undersigned), pursuant to the consent form available on the Southern District website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov /file/forms/consentto- proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge. Plaintiff shall notify the Court, in writing, whether the parties consent no later than the date by which the Joint Stipulation is filed. ( As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/22/2021) (vfr)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/21/2021) (cf)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heetano Shamsoondar on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Shamsoondar, Heetano)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security..(jgo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher D. Latham. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Commmissioner of Social Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Olvin Castro Guzman..(Latham, Christopher)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Latham, Christopher)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commmissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24877657)Document filed by Olvin Castro Guzman..(Latham, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olvin Castro Guzman
Represented By: Christopher D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commmissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heetano Shamsoondar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?