Artman v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis J Artman
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06572
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021; Zimmer, Inc. served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Dennis J Artman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zimmer, Inc, Zimmer US Inc & Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc Executed Summons, #2 Exhibit Email Service by Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit Email Confirmation Service by Defendant).(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
August 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
August 17, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(jgo)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(jgo)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(jgo)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 4, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
August 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa Ann Gorshe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
August 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Ann Gorshe to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gorshe, Lisa) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jgo).
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24884408)Document filed by Dennis J Artman..(Gorshe, Lisa) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artman v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J Artman
Represented By: Lisa Ann Gorshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?