Tonkin v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: William Tonkin
Defendant: Andrew Lee and Lauren Lee
Case Number: 1:2021cv06575
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/27/2021. (ade)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER The dial-in for today's 12 p.m. teleconference is (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 2712517.
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Angelo Lucarelli on behalf of William Tonkin..(Lucarelli, Thomas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action has been assigned to me for all purposes following removal. Counsel are directed to appear telephonically for an initial conference with the Court, on the date and time listed below. Prior to the teleconference, the dial-in and access code information will be posted to ECF. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/25/2021) (va)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Anthony E, Graziani dated August 19, 2021 re: Affidavits of Residency, per Judge's Directive. Document filed by Andrew Lee, Lauren Lee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Residency, #2 Affidavit Residency).(Graziani, Anthony)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Lee regarding residency per Judge's directive. Document filed by Andrew Lee..(Graziani, Anthony)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Lauren Lee regarding residency per Judge's directive. Document filed by Lauren Lee..(Graziani, Anthony)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Anthony E. Graziani, Esq. dated August 18, 2021 re: Securing Affidavits of Residency. Document filed by Andrew Lee, Lauren Lee..(Graziani, Anthony)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Eugene Graziani on behalf of Andrew Lee, Lauren Lee..(Graziani, Anthony)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Francis Scahill from Naomi Reice Buchwald, United States District Judge dated 8/6/2021. ENDORSEMENT: The defendants' notice of removal states that both defendants are residents of New Jersey. In contrast, the complaint states that one of the defendants is a resident of New York. Clearly, if both defendants are not residents of New Jersey, this case has been improperly removed. If defendants continue to maintain that the case is properly removed, then defendants must establish by competent evidence that both defendants are residents of New Jersey. We await your prompt response. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/6/2021) (va)
August 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
August 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scahill, Francis)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 156401/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24884982).Document filed by Lauren Lee, Andrew Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Answer).(Scahill, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonkin v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tonkin
Represented By: Thomas Angelo Lucarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lee
Represented By: Francis Scahill
Represented By: Anthony Eugene Graziani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Lee
Represented By: Francis Scahill
Represented By: Anthony Eugene Graziani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?