Gunsberg v. St. Joseph's School for the Deaf
Plaintiff: Ms. Alexandria Gunsberg
Defendant: St. Joseph's School for the Deaf
Case Number: 1:2021cv06625
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to St. Joseph's School for the Deaf..(jgo)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St. Joseph's School for the Deaf, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Alexandria Gunsberg..(Glass, Maxwell)
August 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Maxwell Jake Glass to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Link the summons to the correctly filed complaint (document 4);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 11, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-24893434, paid on 6/5/2021..(gp)
August 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against St. Joseph's School for the Deaf. Document filed by Alexandria Gunsberg. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue).(Glass, Maxwell)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glass, Maxwell)
August 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Maxwell Jake Glass to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/11/2021. (pc)
August 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Maxwell Jake Glass to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
August 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Maxwell Jake Glass. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St. Joseph's School for the Deaf, re: Complaint. Document filed by Alexandria Gunsberg..(Glass, Maxwell)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glass, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunsberg v. St. Joseph's School for the Deaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Alexandria Gunsberg
Represented By: Maxwell Jake Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph's School for the Deaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?