Rodriguez v. Rotaru-Barac et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rodriguez
Defendant: Anton Rotaru-Barac and A. Duie Pyle, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06736
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service - AOS & Legal Back).(Goldman, David)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Halstrom on behalf of Stephanie Rodriguez..(Halstrom, Robin)
September 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2021. (Court Reporter present) (wv)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Settlement discussions have not taken place. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 7/5/2022. Deposition due by 1/14/2022. Fact Discovery due by 2/5/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/6/2022. Estimate length of trial is 5 days.Status Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/9/2021) (tg)
September 9, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/20/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (tg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Goldman on behalf of A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Goldman, David)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Curtis Sobel, Esq. dated September 8, 2021 re: Joint Letter - Parties do not consent to proceedings before a US Magistrate Judge. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Sobel, Curtis)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Court has received the Parties' September 2, 2021 proposed case management plan and status letter. See Dkt. No. 11. In the proposed case management plan, the parties indicated that they intend to consent to conduct all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, if the Parties consent to conduct further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, they should complete and submit the attached form no later than September 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/2/21) (yv)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Curtis Sobel, Esq. dated 09/02/2021 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Sobel, Curtis)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Proof of Service & Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Order re: #4 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Sobel, Curtis)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bella Pevzner on behalf of A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Pevzner, Bella)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curtis Sobel on behalf of A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Sobel, Curtis)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Judge's Order dated 8-15-21 re: #5 Order,,. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac..(Gross, Aaron)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration with Proof of Service).(Gross, Aaron)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx, on August 10, 2021. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than August 24, 2021. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/15/2021) (rro)
August 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Telephonic Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/15/2021) (tg) Modified on 8/18/2021 (tg).
August 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Gross, Aaron)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Gross, Aaron)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court - State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 805855/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24913529).Document filed by A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Anton Rotaru-Barac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Admit, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint with Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Verified Answer & Combined Discovery Demands, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Gross, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Rotaru-Barac et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rodriguez
Represented By: Robin Halstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Rotaru-Barac
Represented By: Aaron Christopher Gross
Represented By: Bella Pevzner
Represented By: Curtis Sobel
Represented By: David M. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Duie Pyle, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Christopher Gross
Represented By: Bella Pevzner
Represented By: Curtis Sobel
Represented By: David M. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?