Eagle Printing Company v. GOOGLE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eagle Printing Company
Defendant: Google LLC and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06881
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number: 2:21-cv-00518. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Southern District of New York (MDL 3010). (cww) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Justina K. Sessions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 6/29/21. (akr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to move or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint is hereby extended to 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 ("Transfer Motion"), or, if the Transfer Motion is granted, to the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 6/28/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (akr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney JUSTINA K. SESSIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6575855) by GOOGLE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Sessions, Justina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 6/2/21. (ndf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Vanessa A. Lavely to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 6/2/21. (ndf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Peter T. Barbur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 6/2/21. (ndf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6536952) by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Vanessa A. Lavely to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6536907) by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Lavely, Vanessa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Peter T. Barbur to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6536881) by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Barbur, Peter) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EAGLE PRINTING COMPANY. FACEBOOK, INC. waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EAGLE PRINTING COMPANY. GOOGLE, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that th e moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/23/2021. (et) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK, INC., GOOGLE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6467119), filed by EAGLE PRINTING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Printing Company v. GOOGLE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Printing Company
Represented By: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Justina Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Peter Barbur
Represented By: Vanessa Lavely
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Vanessa Allen Lavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?