Gale Force Media, LLC v. Google, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gale Force Media, LLC
Defendant: Google LLC and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06909
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:21-cv-09716. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York.(MDL 3010 In Re: Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation Judge P. Kevin Castel)(gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JONATHAN M. JACOBSON and JUSTINA K. SESSIONS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Justina K. Sessions to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MOLLICK, JASON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan M. Jacobson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MOLLICK, JASON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number CAM012764 as to Justina Sessions (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number CAM012749 (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JUSTINA K. SESSIONS, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/17/2021. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JONATHAN M. JACOBSON, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/17/2021. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (JUSTINA K. SESSIONS) by GOOGLE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOLLICK, JASON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (JONATHAN M. JACOBSON) by GOOGLE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOLLICK, JASON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants' deadline to move or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint is extended to 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, or, if the Transfer Motion is granted, to the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to move or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/13/2021. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORSINI, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE: Brief in Support of motion before the JMPL to transfer action to the Northern District of California MDL 3010 In Re: Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FACEBOOK, INC., GOOGLE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK, INC., GOOGLE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12385885) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GALE FORCE MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VASH, SERINA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale Force Media, LLC v. Google, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Force Media, LLC
Represented By: Serina M. Vash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Jason Blake Mollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?