Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Brown & Davis Excavators Inc.
Defendant: Brown & Davis Excavators Inc.
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Case Number: 1:2021cv06950
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, served. Brown & Davis Excavators Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Grancio, Adrianna)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order issued by Judge Alison J. Nathan on September 16, 2021 and the Individual Rules of Judge Alison J. Nathan served on Brown & Davis Excavators Inc. on September 17, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, November 12, 2021 at 3:15 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED parties are to submit their Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Joint Letter, as directed below, no later than Wednesday, November 3, 2021. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. Counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/honalison-j-nathan. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed to notify all other parties attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Courts Individual Rules (available at the Courts website, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan) forthwith. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/14/21) (yv) Modified on 9/21/2021 (yv).
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brown & Davis Excavators Inc. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marimon on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Grancio, Adrianna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Grancio, Adrianna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brown & Davis Excavators Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Grancio, Adrianna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grancio, Adrianna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24951060).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Remittance Detail Report, #2 Interim Compliance Agreement, #3 IND DOCKBUILDERS 11-17, #4 January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #5 June 25, 2020 Notice of Hearing, #6 August 19, 2020 Arbitration Award, #7 History Bill, #8 Proposed Judgment).(Grancio, Adrianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Brown & Davis Excavators Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Davis Excavators Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?