ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC v. Essar Global Fund Limited et al
Plaintiff: ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC
Defendant: Essar Global Fund Limited
Garnishee: Mesabi Metallics Company LLC and Essar Steel Minnesota LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06975
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter, filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions in connection with Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #14, 17). The Court wishes to convene a pre-motion conference to discuss this motion. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a telephone conference on November 3, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. The dial-in information is as follows: At 4:00 p.m the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Please note, the conference will not be available prior to 4:00 p.m. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/1/2021) (rro)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason William Myatt on behalf of ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Myatt, Jason)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. Serio on behalf of ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Serio, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Weigel dated September 24, 2021 re: response to September 17, 2021 letter (ECF No. 14). Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ICC Award (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 - ICC Award (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 1 - ICC Award (Part 3), #4 Exhibit 2 - Terms of Reference, #5 Exhibit 3 - May 23, 2017 Email, #6 Exhibit 4 - Essar About Us Page).(Weigel, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Essar Global Fund Limited served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. Service was accepted by Mr. Andre Slabbert. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Copper Canyon Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Kettle River Holdings Limited for Essar Global Fund Limited; Other Affiliate Mesabi Holdings LLC for Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. Document filed by Essar Global Fund Limited, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC..(Baker, Rollo)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rollo C. Baker dated 09/17/2021 re: pre-motion conference. Document filed by Essar Global Fund Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - 2020.03.30 Judgment of Henshaw J (WFO Application), #2 Exhibit Ex B - 2021.06.25 Reply to 8910 Defendants dated 25 June 2021, #3 Exhibit Ex C - 41. EGFL's Plaint with Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex D - 2021.03.24 MdR Re-Amended Particulars of Claim).(Baker, Rollo)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Ray Jones, Area Manager. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mesabi Metallics Company LLC served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. Service was accepted by Chris Olund of Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE'S JOINT PRE-MOTION TO DISMISS LETTER AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSIVE LETTER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows:The deadline for Defendant and Garnishee to file their pre-motion to dismiss letter, andtherefore to stay the time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint pursuant tothis Court's Individual Rule Of Practice In Civil Cases 4.A, will be set to and includingSeptember 17, 2021.The deadline for Plaintiff to file its opposition letter to Defendant and Garnishee's pre-motionto dismiss letter will be set to and including September 24, 2021.By entering this stipulation the parties expressly preserve and do not waive all claims anddefenses, including for lack of personal jurisdiction.IT IS SO STIPULATED. So ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/10/2021) (rro)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Essar Global Fund Limited, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC..(Baker, Rollo)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Beattie on behalf of Essar Global Fund Limited, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC..(Beattie, Todd)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rollo Clyde Baker, IV on behalf of Essar Global Fund Limited, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC..(Baker, Rollo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mesabi Metallics Company LLC..(jgo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Essar Global Fund Limited..(jgo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mesabi Metallics Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Essar Global Fund Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arcelormittal S.A. for ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC. Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider).(Weigel, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Essar Global Fund Limited, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24953369)Document filed by ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC..(Weigel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC v. Essar Global Fund Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mesabi Metallics Company LLC
Represented By: Rollo Clyde Baker, IV
Represented By: Todd Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Essar Steel Minnesota LLC
Represented By: Rollo Clyde Baker, IV
Represented By: Todd Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ArcelorMittal North America Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert L Weigel
Represented By: Jason William Myatt
Represented By: Robert F. Serio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essar Global Fund Limited
Represented By: Rollo Clyde Baker, IV
Represented By: Todd Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?