Reid v. John or Jane Doe et al
Plaintiff: James Reid
Defendant: JOHN OR JANE DOES 1-0, RE-STEEL SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.,, John or Jane Doe and Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06991
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedingsbefore a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 1/13/2022. Deposition due by 12/15/2021. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 1/13/2022. Discovery due by 1/13/2022. Status Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 to 4 days. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/16/2021) (rro)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by James Reid..(Popescu, Andrei)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT and Response to Court's Order and Notice of Initial Conference. Document filed by James Reid..(Popescu, Andrei)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrei Alexandru Popescu on behalf of James Reid..(Popescu, Andrei)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josefina Alicia Belmonte on behalf of Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Belmonte, Josefina)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Thomas Burke, New Attorney: Josefina Belmonte, Address: Correia King McGinnis & Liferiedge, 10 Bank Street - Suite 1200, White Plains, New York, US 10606, 212-709-3122. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Belmonte, Josefina)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by September 13, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs, as further set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties also jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Broderick. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with Section 13.1 of the Courts Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-relatedinstructions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/30/2021) (vfr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Burke, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Answer with Demands).(Burke, Thomas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burke, Thomas)
August 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Joseph Burke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JAMES REID; JOHN JANE DOES 1-10; RE-STEEL SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Burke. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 809642/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24956394).Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- S&C, #2 Exhibit B-AOS).(Burke, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. John or Jane Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN OR JANE DOES 1-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE-STEEL SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.,
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Josefina Alicia Belmonte
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?