Assad v. Go Acquisition Corp. et al
Plaintiff: George Assad
Defendant: Go Acquisition Founder LLC., Noam Gottesman, M. Gregory OHara, Jeremy Isaacs, Gilbert Ahye and Norma Corio
Nominal Defendant: Go Acquisition Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07076
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Matthew S. Dontzin dated November 5, 2021 re: request for oral argument. Document filed by Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Dontzin, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 25, 2021 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Robert J. Jackson, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
October 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Robert J. Jackson, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25193396. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 14, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Robert J. Jackson, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25193396. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by George Assad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. Jackson, Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Jackson, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Sparks Bradley on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Sparks Bradley, Rachel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Patrick Blake on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Blake, Stephen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Youngwood, Jonathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Kolbe on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Kolbe, Jason)
October 5, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Fleissig on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Fleissig, David)
October 5, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Nagy, Tibor)
October 4, 2021 Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Go Acquisition Corp...(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Matthew S. Dontzin in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara. (Attachments: #1 GO Registration Statement, #2 GO Prospectus, #3 GO Notice of Effectiveness, #4 GO Cert. of Incorporation, #5 GO Trust Agreement, #6 GO 2020 10-K/A, #7 GO June 2021 10-Q, #8 GO September 2020 10-Q, #9 GO Class B Sub. Agreement, #10 GO Aug. 2020 Press Release, #11 GO Sept. 2020 Press Release).(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(Fitzgerald, Steven)
October 4, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara. Responses due by 10/25/2021.(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Seldin Dontzin on behalf of Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara..(Dontzin, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeremy Isaacs waiver sent on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Document filed by George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gilbert Ahye waiver sent on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Document filed by George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Norma Corio waiver sent on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Document filed by George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Noam Gottesman waiver sent on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Document filed by George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. M. Gregory OHara waiver sent on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Document filed by George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter requesting a pre-motion conference in advance of its forthcoming motion to dismiss, Dkt. 33, and Plaintiff's response to Defendants' pre-motion letter, Dkt. 34. Upon reviewing the parties' letters, the Court finds that a pre-motion conference is not necessary, and that Defendants may proceed in filing the motion to dismiss. Defendants' motion papers are due by October 4, 2021. Plaintiff's opposition papers are due by October 25, 2021. Defendants' reply papers, if any, are due November 5, 2021.In accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, requests for extensions or adjournment may be made only by letter-motion filed on ECF and must be received at least 48 hours (i.e., two business days) before the deadline or scheduled appearance, absent compelling circumstances. The written submission must state (1) the original date(s) set for the appearance or deadline(s) and the new date(s) requested; (2) the reason(s) for the request; (3) the number of previous requests for adjournment or extension; (4) whether these previous requests were granted or denied; and (5) whether opposing counsel consents, and, if not, the reasons given by opposing counsel for refusing to consent. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 10/4/2021., Responses due by 10/25/2021, Replies due by 11/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/27/2021) (jca)
September 23, 2021 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Shawn J. Rabin dated September 23, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' September 20, 2021 Letter. Document filed by George Assad..(Rabin, Shawn)
September 20, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Defendants dated September 20, 2021 re: request for pre-motion conference regarding anticipated motions to dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Go Acquisition Corp...(Dontzin, Matthew)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for John Morley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
September 16, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for John Morley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25071785. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by George Assad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Morley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Morley, John)
September 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for John Morley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25071785. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request for an extension for GO and GO Founder to respond to the Complaint from September 14, 2021 until September 24, 2021, is hereby granted, on consent. As Judge Cronan has referred this case to me for general pretrial supervision, future applications of this kind should be directed to my attention. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Kolbe on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Kolbe, Jason)
September 14, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Fleissig on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Fleissig, David)
September 14, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grant Bercari on behalf of Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(Bercari, Grant)
September 14, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Nagy, Tibor)
September 14, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Mark Slocum on behalf of Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(Slocum, Joshua)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Sanford Fitzgerald on behalf of Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(Fitzgerald, Steven)
September 14, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H Wollmuth on behalf of Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(Wollmuth, David)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul DeFilippo on behalf of Go Acquisition Founder LLC...(DeFilippo, Paul)
September 13, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Sparks Bradley on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Sparks Bradley, Rachel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Patrick Blake on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Blake, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Youngwood, Jonathan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Matthew S. Dontzin dated September 13, 2021. Document filed by Go Acquisition Corp...(Dontzin, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Seldin Dontzin on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp...(Dontzin, Matthew)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/8/2021) (vfr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Shawn J. Rabin dated August 27, 2021 re: Response to Letter filed by Pershing Square Holdings, Ltd., et al [21-cv-6907 - dkt. 29] re Local Civil Rule 1.6 Disclosure. Document filed by George Assad..(Rabin, Shawn)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Go Acquisition Founder LLC. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Service was accepted by Litigation Management Representative. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Go Acquisition Corp. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Service was accepted by Litigation Management Representative. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Go Acquisition Founder LLC. (vf)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Go Acquisition Corp.. (vf)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara. (vf)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Beatrice Catherine Franklin on behalf of George Assad..(Franklin, Beatrice)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cory Spencer Buland on behalf of George Assad..(Buland, Cory)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Shackelford, Jr on behalf of George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of George Assad..(Rabin, Shawn)
August 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Lebovitch re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party George Assad with party text (and derivatively on behalf of Go Acquisition Corp.). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
August 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Lebovitch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: George Assad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GO Acquisition Founder LLC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GO Acquisition Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noam Gottesman, M. Gregory O'Hara, Jeremy Isaacs, Gilbert Ahye, and Norma Corio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lebovitch, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilbert Ahye, Norma Corio, Go Acquisition Corp., Go Acquisition Founder LLC., Noam Gottesman, Jeremy Isaacs, M. Gregory OHara. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24965343)Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assad v. Go Acquisition Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Assad
Represented By: Mark Lebovitch
Represented By: Beatrice Catherine Franklin
Represented By: Cory Spencer Buland
Represented By: John Morley
Represented By: Robert Jackson
Represented By: Shawn J. Rabin
Represented By: Stephen Shackelford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Acquisition Founder LLC.
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: Joshua Mark Slocum
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: Grant Bercari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noam Gottesman
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gregory OHara
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Isaacs
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Ahye
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Corio
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Go Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: David A. Fleissig
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Matthew Seldin Dontzin
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?